MO SB798 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 798 & 514-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 798 & 514-Emery, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education standards and assessments
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education standards and assessments
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 798 & 514-Emery, with SCS |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-04-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 798 & 514) S Education Committee (5475S.07C) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2014-01-29 | Senate | S First Read--SB 798-Emery |