MO SB825 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 894 & 825)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 894 & 825)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the promotion of business development
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the promotion of business development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 894 & 825) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |