MO SB844 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any amount paid on behalf of a health benefit plan enrollee to count toward the enrollee's cost-sharing
Title
Requires any amount paid on behalf of a health benefit plan enrollee to count toward the enrollee's cost-sharing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |