MO SB844 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to livestock trespass liability
Title
Modifies provisions relating to livestock trespass liability
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] | Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 844 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-03 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-03 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 S defeated |
2016-03-29 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 1 S offered & defeated (Emery)--(5555S01.05S) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 S offered (Schaaf)--(5555S01.04S) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 844-Parson |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled |