MO SB849 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Local Government Committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Local Government Committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law regarding emergency service boards
Title
Modifies provisions of law regarding emergency service boards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred H Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-29 | H Second Read | |
2010-03-25 | H First Read | |
2010-03-25 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Perfected | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor | |
2010-03-09 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2010-03-03 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-28 | S First Read--SB 849-Barnitz |