MO SB849 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 849-Kehoe and Schupp, with SCS, SA 1 & SA 1 to SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 849-Kehoe and Schupp, with SCS, SA 1 & SA 1 to SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public bodies from entering into certain contracts
Title
Prohibits public bodies from entering into certain contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] | Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 849-Kehoe and Schupp, with SCS, SA 1 & SA 1 to SA 1 (pending) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(5601S02.01F) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(5601S02.01S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (5601S.02C) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 849-Kehoe and Schupp |