MO SB849 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Stars and Stripes Historic Region of Missouri"
Title
Establishes the "Stars and Stripes Historic Region of Missouri"
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S General Laws Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |