MO SB858 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to investigations of child abuse or neglect
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to investigations of child abuse or neglect
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5538S.03C) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 858-Curls |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB858.pdf |