MO SB859 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-16 - Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Division of Professional Registration to regulate mixed martial arts and creates rules for amateur contests
Title
Authorizes the Division of Professional Registration to regulate mixed martial arts and creates rules for amateur contests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-04-02 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-29 | S First Read--SB 859-Nieves |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3076143 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB859.pdf |