MO SB859 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 859-Koenig, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 859-Koenig, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 859-Koenig, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-17 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(5187S.12F) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2018-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (5187S.05C) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 859-Koenig |