MO SB868 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from property tax land that is an out-of-service rail corridor being used as a trail under federal law
Title
Exempts from property tax land that is an out-of-service rail corridor being used as a trail under federal law
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 868-Kehoe |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71153465 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB868.pdf |