MO SB876 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits beer manufacturers and liquor wholesalers from owning certain interests in each other
Title
Prohibits beer manufacturers and liquor wholesalers from owning certain interests in each other
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] | Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2012-04-03 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2012-02-29 | S First Read--SB 876-Kehoe and Parson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3099332 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB876.pdf |