MO SB881 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (6068S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (6068S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (6068S.02C) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 881-Sifton |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=30614357 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB881.pdf |