MO SB881 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to special license plates
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to special license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 881 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 881 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 881 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 7) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 84 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (*HA 14) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 86 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 14) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 881 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 881 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 7) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 5) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 84 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 87 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (*HA 14) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 86 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 881 (HA 14) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2018-05-18 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-18 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Eigel) |
2018-05-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-17 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-17 | House | H distributes CCR (5773S06.01F) |
2018-05-17 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Eigel, Schatz, Libla, Hummel, Curls |
2018-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Davis, Korman, Reiboldt, McCreery, Razer |
2018-05-17 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-05-17 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-16 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 18 to HCS H offered & adopted (Tate)--(5773H05.25H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Corlew)--(5773H05.40H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 16 go HCS H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(5773H05.15H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(5773H05.05H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(5773H05.44H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rhoads)--(5773H05.39H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(5773H05.36H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(5773H05.20H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick)--(5773H05.04H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(5773H05.09H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shaul)--(5773H05.31H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Matthiesen)--(5773H05.35H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Tate)--(5773H05.22H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(5773H05.34H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(5773H05.27H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & ruled out of order (Fraker)--(5773H05.12H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 2 to HCS H defeated |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Toalson-Reisch)--(5773H05.43H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Wiemann)--(5773H05.32H) |
2018-05-16 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(5773H05.01H) |
2018-05-11 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill Placed Back on Formal Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2018-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2018-04-11 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2018-03-12 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-08 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-08 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-01 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(5773S.02F) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 881-Eigel |