MO SB906 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5747S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5747S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Missouri Task Force on Fair, Nondiscriminatory Local Taxation Concerning Motor Vehicles, Trailers, Boats, and Outboard Motors"
Title
Creates the "Missouri Task Force on Fair, Nondiscriminatory Local Taxation Concerning Motor Vehicles, Trailers, Boats, and Outboard Motors"
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Wasson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5747S.03C) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 906-Wasson |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=24429793 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB906.pdf |