MO SB936 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Initiative within the Department of Higher Education
Title
Establishes the Missouri Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics Initiative within the Department of Higher Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2010-02-11 | S First Read--SB 936-Pearce |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3286680 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB936.pdf |