MO SB936 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (5886S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (5886S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the impact of certain development projects on certain emergency districts
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the impact of certain development projects on certain emergency districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (5886S.02C) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 936-Eigel |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=72000146 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB936.pdf |