MO SB937 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 937-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 937-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the authority for regional jail districts to impose a sales tax until September 30, 2027
Title
Extends the authority for regional jail districts to impose a sales tax until September 30, 2027
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 937 (*HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 937 (*HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 937 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 937 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 937 (*HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 937 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House: SB 937 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SB 937-Wallingford, with HCS, as amended |
2016-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-11 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(6051H07.33H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(6051H07.20H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(6051H07.09H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Alferman)--(6051H07.27H) |
2016-05-11 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(6051H07.11H) |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/HCA 1 & HCA 2 |
2016-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues w/Amendments |
2016-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-02 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(6051S.03F) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | S First Read--SB 937-Wallingford |