MO SB944 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 944-Shields (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 944-Shields (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates state and local sales and use tax exemptions
Title
Creates state and local sales and use tax exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 944-Shields (In Fiscal Oversight) | |
2010-03-23 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Perfected | |
2010-03-22 | SCS S adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-03-17 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (5040S.02C) | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-02-15 | S First Read--SB 944-Shields |