MO SB963 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 963-Wieland, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 963-Wieland, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions providing for expedited purchasing processes for innovative technology
Title
Creates new provisions providing for expedited purchasing processes for innovative technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 963-Wieland, with SCS |
2018-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (5437S.03C) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 963-Wieland |