MO SB973 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 973-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 973-Brown
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the office of the Child Advocate to intervene on behalf of a child during judicial proceedings
Title
Allows the office of the Child Advocate to intervene on behalf of a child during judicial proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 973-Brown |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee to Floor |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 973-Brown |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=31480682 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB973.pdf |