MO SB973 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies salaries for certain police officers in Kansas City
Title
Modifies salaries for certain police officers in Kansas City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2018-05-18 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2018-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2018-05-08 | House | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety |
2018-04-24 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-19 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | S First Read--SB 973-Rizzo |