MO SB981 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions of law regarding sales taxes
Title
Modifies various provisions of law regarding sales taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-14 | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated | |
2010-05-14 | H/S recedes on HCS, as amended | |
2010-05-14 | S requests H recede & take up and pass bill | |
2010-05-14 | Motion to dissolve conference committee S adopted | |
2010-05-13 | H submitted CCR/CCS | |
2010-05-12 | H conferees appointed: Sutherland, Hobbs, Nance, Kelly, Komo | |
2010-05-12 | S conferees appointed: Callahan, Green, Griesheimer, Dempsey, Crowell | |
2010-05-12 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2010-05-12 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2010-05-12 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2010-05-12 | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated | |
2010-05-12 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-12 | HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-12 | HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pratt)--(5191L05.04L) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 8 to HCS H offered (Nolte)--(5191L05.19H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-12 | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Skaggs)--(5191L05.26H) | |
2010-05-12 | HSA 1 for HA 7 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Skaggs)--(5191L05.24H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Kelly)--(5191L05.13H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruestman)--(5191L05.08H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruestman)--(5191L05.02H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-89)--(5191L05.10H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schoeller)--(5191L05.11H) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sater)--(5191L05.01L) | |
2010-05-12 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sutherland)--(5191L05.05H) | |
2010-05-06 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review | |
2010-05-06 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review | |
2010-05-05 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2010-05-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-05-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-05-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-04-27 | HCS Reconsidered H Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-04-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-04-13 | Referred H Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-03-23 | H Second Read | |
2010-03-22 | H First Read (w/EC) | |
2010-03-22 | S Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2010-03-03 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-22 | S First Read--SB 981-Callahan |