MO SB981 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to methods of self-insurance for workers' compensation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to methods of self-insurance for workers' compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 981 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 981-Wieland |