MO SB998 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 998-Romine (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 998-Romine (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to appropriations, requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to subsidize the exam fee for those taking the high school equivalency degree exam for the first time
Title
Subject to appropriations, requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to subsidize the exam fee for those taking the high school equivalency degree exam for the first time
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 998-Romine (In Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-12 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee, with SCS |
2016-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (6289S.02C) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | S First Read--SB 998-Romine |