MS HB1030 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-1-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Executive Director Of Human Services To Appoint A Nonresident Of The County To Serve As The County Director Of Human Services Under Certain Circumstances; To Authorize The Department Of Human Services To Enter Into A Lease With The Board Of Supervisors In Each County Where A Local Office Is Located To Allow The Department To Maximize The Availability Of Federal Funds; To Provide That Fair Market Value For The County-furnished Building Shall Be Established By Consultation Between The Department And Each County Board Of Supervisors, And The Department Shall Pay The Federal Share For The Rent To The County; To Provide That All Maintenance And Repairs Of The Local Office Required To Keep It In An Adequate And Habitable Condition For Use By The Department Shall Be The Responsibility Of The County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DHS; authorize to enter into lease with counties having local offices to maximize federal funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2024-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-05 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To PH |
2024-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: PH To CA |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;County Affairs |