MS HB1316 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-46-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Administer The Mississippi Railroad Improvements Fund; To Amend Section 45, Chapter 480, Laws Of 2011, To Authorize The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Declare By Resolution The Necessity For Issuance Of General Obligation Bonds Of The State Of Mississippi For The Mississippi Railroad Improvements Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Railroad Improvements Fund; authorize MS Transportation Commission to administer and declare necessity for bond issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Died In Conference | |
2012-04-27 | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Fillingane,Jolly | |
2012-04-25 | Conferees Named Johnson,Horan,Monsour | |
2012-04-24 | Conferees Named Johnson,Stringer,Monsour | |
2012-04-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2012-04-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Amended | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-04-02 | DR - TSDPAA: HI To FI | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Finance | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | DR - TSDP: WM To TR | |
2012-02-28 | DR - TSDP: TR To WM | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Transportation;Ways and Means |