MS HB1463 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 65-3-71.341, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify The Parameters Of The Segment Of Mississippi Highway 28 In Copiah County That Is To Be Designated As The "carroll V. Hood Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Carrol V. Hood Memorial Highway"; specify parameters of location for designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Transportation |