MS HB1471 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 77-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Any Officer Or Employee Of The Office Of Broadband Expansion And Accessibility Of Mississippi From Accepting Or Receiving, Either Directly Or Indirectly, Any Gratuity, Gift, Gift In-kind, Money, Emolument, Or Any Other Pecuniary Benefit From Any Broadband Service Provider, Vendor, Contractor, Or Subcontractor That Does Business With Or Contracts With The Office; To Provide Certain Requirements For Final Determinations Of Awards For Projects To Provide Broadband Access In Unserved Or Underserved Areas; And For Related Purposes.
Title
BEAM; prohibit from accepting gifts or other benefits from any broadband service provider, vendor, or contractor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-22 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Carter,Williams,McMahan |
2024-04-15 | House | Conferees Named Powell,Lancaster,Steverson |
2024-04-12 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |