MS HB1625 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-24-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Business Entities To Report Breaches Of Security To The Office Of The Attorney General; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Corporate breach of security; require reports to the Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Technology |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Business and Commerce |