MS HB1749 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Biloxi To Conduct A Hearing To Determine Whether Certain Property Within The Municipality Is Blighted Property Or In Such A State Of Uncleanliness As To Be A Menace To The Public Health, Safety And Welfare Of The Community; To Define "blighted Property"; To Provide The Form Of Notice That Shall Be Given To An Affected Landowner; To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Biloxi To Adjudicate The Actual Cost Of Cleaning Certain Property And To Impose Penalties; To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Biloxi To Collect Costs And Penalties As A Civil Debt Or As A Lien Against The Property; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Biloxi; authorize to clean certain property and assess costs and penalties to landowner for such cleaning.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Rep. Frances Fredericks [D] | Rep. Roger Ishee [R] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R] | Rep. Randall Patterson [R] | Rep. Diane Peranich [D] | Rep. Jessica Upshaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Died In Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Passed | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-03-26 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |