MS HB1751 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 58, Laws Of The Extraordinary Session Of 1954, As Last Amended By Chapter 942, Local And Private Laws Of 2008, To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Harrison County, Mississippi, To Enter Into Contracts With Not-for-profit Organizations For The Purpose Of Advertising, Marketing And Promoting Tourism And Conventions Within The County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Harrison County; authorize board of supervisors to enter into certain contracts to promote tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Passed | |
2010-04-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-04-22 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Passed | |
2010-04-21 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-03-26 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |