MS HB1758 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Suffrage; restore to LaTonya Woodson of Warren County.
Title
Suffrage; restore to LaTonya Woodson of Warren County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-03-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-27 | House | Passed |
2022-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |