MS HB342 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 89-2-3 And 89-2-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add Cycling To The Activities Exempt From Liability For Recreational Landowners; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Recreational landowners; add cycling to the list of activities exempt from liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Shanks [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hood, Yates) |
2024-03-12 | House | Passed |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
89 | 2 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |