MS HB582 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-21-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Base Salaries Of Assistant Teachers By The Amount Of One Thousand Dollars Beginning With The 2015-2016 School Year, To A Total Of Fifteen Thousand Dollars In Addition To The One Percent Increase To The Base Salary Established For Assistant Teachers For Each One Percent That The Sine Die General Fund Revenue Estimate Growth Exceeds Five Percent; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Assistant teachers; increase base salary by $1,000.00.
Sponsors
Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Randall Patterson [R] | Rep. Greg Haney [R] | Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations;Education |
2015-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-02-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Moore, Clarke, Frierson) |
2015-02-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-11 | House | Amended |
2015-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To ED |
2015-01-28 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |