MS HB921 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require A Qualified Elector Who Appears To Vote At The Registrar's Office Or A Polling Place To Present Identification Before Voting; To Require The Secretary Of State To Negotiate A Memorandum Of Understanding Between The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety And The Registrar Of Each County For The Purpose Of Providing A Mississippi Voter Identification Card; To Amend Sections 23-15-135, 23-15-11, 23-15-541, 23-15-631, 13-15-639, 23-15-719 And 45-1-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Sections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Voter identification; require for all elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Failed to Suspend Rules (Y: 77 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Failed to Suspend Rules (Y: 77 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-26 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2012-04-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-10 | Amended | |
2012-04-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-20 | Referred To Elections | |
2012-03-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-03-14 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Buck (5th), Denny, Horne) | |
2012-03-14 | Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Read the Third Time | |
2012-03-13 | Failed to Suspend Rules | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |