MS HC116 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Honoring The Loyalty, Faithfulness And Dedicated Service Of Lex, And Extending Deepest Sympathy To His Adopted Family Upon His Passing.
Title
"Lex"; honor the loyalty, faithfulness and dedicated service of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-29 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-29 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-29 | Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-20 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-20 | Adopted | |
2012-04-17 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-16 | Referred To Rules |