MS HC118 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Service Of The Mississippi Poultry Association Provided To The Agricultural Industry Of The State Of Mississippi And Congratulating The Association On The Occasion Of Its 75th Anniversary.
Title
Mississippi Poultry Association; commend and congratulate on the occasion of its 75th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-29 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-29 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-29 | Adopted | |
2012-04-28 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-25 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-04-25 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-25 | Adopted | |
2012-04-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-04-20 | Referred To Rules |