MS HC15 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Urging The State Of Louisiana To Provide Reciprocity For Mississippians With Valid Gun Permits.
Title
Reciprocity; urge Louisiana to provide for Mississippi gun permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-13 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Died In Committee | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-01-13 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-13 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-13 | Adopted | |
2010-01-12 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Rules |