MS HR132 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending Mr. Alan Caldwell Hunter, A 1979 Graduate Of Millsaps College And The First Vj To Appear On Mtv, Upon His Career Accomplishments In The Film And Television Industries.
Title
Alan Hunter; commend Millsaps graduate upon being the first VJ on MTV and upon his contributions to film and television.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred To Rules |