MS HR160 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Recognizing And Commending Ingomar High School Lady Falcons Basketball Team For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 2a Girls Basketball State Championship.
Title
Ingomar High School Lady Falcons Basketball Team; commend for winning 2024 MHSAA Class 2A Girls Basketball State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-04 | House | Immediate Release |
2024-05-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-05-03 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-05-02 | House | Referred To Rules |