MS SB2130 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That If An Insurer Has Issued To An Insured A Policy That Provides Coverage Or A Binder That Binds Coverage Of A Residential Structure, The Insurer Shall Not Cancel The Policy, Cancel The Binder, Or Deny Coverage Solely Because Of The Age Of The Roof Of The Residential Structure; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Homeowners' insurance; prohibit insurer from cancelling or denying coverage solely due to roof's age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-05-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2024-04-30 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Hood,Yates,Waldo |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,Johnson |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | House | Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |