MS SB2509 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-23-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Provisions Concerning The Maximum Limits On The Height Of Outdoor Advertising Signs; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Outdoor advertising signs; revise height limit provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Busby,Massengill,Weathersby |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,Barnett |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Transportation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-02-01 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: HI To JA |
2022-01-25 | Senate | DR - TSDP: JA To HI |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Highways and Transportation |