MS SB3010 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Natchez, Mississippi, And The Board Of Supervisors Of Adams County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To Natchez, Inc., A Mississippi Nonprofit Corporation Organized For Economic Development Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Natchez/Adams County; authorize contributions to Natchez, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-23 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2012-04-19 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-19 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-19 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-19 | Amended | |
2012-04-17 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-05 | Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-22 | Referred To Local and Private |