MS SB3055 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation Of Capital Expense Funds, And Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of The Office Of The Attorney General For Fiscal Year 2022 And Fiscal Year 2023; The Department Of Finance And Administration For Fiscal Year 2022; The Wireless Communication Commission For Fiscal Year 2022; The Joint Reapportionment Committee For Fiscal Year 2022; The State Department Of Health For Fiscal Year 2022; The Institutions Of Higher Learning – Office Of Student Financial Aid For Fiscal Year 2022; The Governor's Office - Division Of Medicaid For Fiscal Year 2022; The State Veterans Affairs Board For Fiscal Year 2022; The State Department Of Health For Fiscal Year 2022 And Fiscal Year 2023; The Mississippi Emergency Management Agency For Fiscal Year 2022; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriations; additional appropriations for various state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Cockerham,Oliver |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Jackson (11th) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | House | Amended |
2022-03-10 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |