MS SB3231 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-11-123, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Increase In The Employer's Contribution Rate That Is Scheduled To Take Effect On July 1, 2024, Is Rescinded And Shall Not Take Effect; To Provide For A 1/2% Increase In The Employer's Contribution Rate On July 1 Of Each Year From 2024 Through 2028; To Require That Any Recommendation By The Board Of Trustees Of The Public Employees' Retirement System To Adjust Employer Contributions Be Accompanied By At Least Two Independent Actuarial Assessments; To Allow The Board To Make Recommendations Regarding Additional Funding Sources For The Retirement Plan, Including Employer Contribution Increases, Based On The Plan's Assets And Liabilities, And The Required Actuarial Assessments; To Reserve To The Legislature The Authority To Implement Such Recommendations; To Express The Intent Of The Legislature That, In The 2025 Regular Session, A Law Be Enacted To Create A New Tier For Future Members Of The System, In Furtherance Of The System's Continued Financial Stability And Sustainability; To Specify That The Section Shall Not Be Construed To Provide Authority To Reduce Or Eliminate Any Earned Benefits Provided By The State To Current Retirees Or Current Members Of The Retirement System; And For Related Purposes.
Title
PERS; revise employer contribution rate increase, and redefine responsibilities of board and Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Law W/out Governor's Signature | |
2024-04-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-04-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Johnson, Zuber) |
2024-04-27 | House | Passed |
2024-04-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-26 | House | Referred To State Affairs |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |