MS SC633 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Cultural Contributions Of The Central Mississippi Blues Society And Their Talented Blues Performers.
Title
Recognize the cultural contributions of the Central Mississippi Blues Society and performers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] |
Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |