NC H1049 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bladen Community College Fed Loan Program
Title
Bladen Community College Fed Loan Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Second Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 68 N: 44 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2012 | |
2012-06-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-23 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2012-05-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-22 | Filed |