NC H1062 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Ch. SL 2020-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Ch. SL 2020-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Beaufort County/Animal Services Records
Title
Beaufort County/Animal Services Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Ch. SL 2020-10 | |
2020-06-10 | Ratified | |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2020-05-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/27/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-05-26 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2020-05-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-06 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-05-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-06 | House | Filed |