NC H1071 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Use Methods of Certain Groups/Voter Rolls
Title
Use Methods of Certain Groups/Voter Rolls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2024-06-27 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-05-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-05-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Data & Records Systems
Elections
Information Technology
Public
Public Officials
Records
Reporting
Session Laws
State Board Of
Voter Registration
Data & Records Systems
Elections
Information Technology
Public
Public Officials
Records
Reporting
Session Laws
State Board Of
Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
163 | 82.14 | (n/a) | Citation Text |